04/07/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
03/28/2011 | File Number 219 | |||
03/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 172 | |||
03/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/07/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/02 | |||
02/14/2011 | Public Hearing 02/18 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Planning and Development |