05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/14/2011 | File Number 61 | |||
03/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 69 | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/14/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/24/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/15 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |