05/17/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Commerce | |||
03/08/2011 | File Number 47 | |||
03/08/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 54 | |||
03/08/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/08/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/07/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/24/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/17 | |||
02/04/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |