|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-230
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
House Calendar Number 402
|
|
|
|
04/28/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5512
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
File Number 207
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 153
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|