|
06/08/2011
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by House Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted House Amendment Schedule A 8636
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
House Calendar Number 543
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
File Number 75
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 92
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on General Law
|
|
|