|
07/01/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Public Act 11-52
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
House Calendar Number 555
|
|
|
|
05/26/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule H 7108
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule G 7208
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule F 7120
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule E 7131
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule D 7174
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule C 7087
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 7206
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7200
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/09/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
File Number 76
|
|
|
|
03/17/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 97
|
|
|
|
03/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/24/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/07/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|