03/16/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
03/09/2011 | File Number 48 | |||
03/09/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 61 | |||
03/09/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/09/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/14/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/07/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement |