06/05/2011 | House Calendar Number 612 | |||
06/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/04/2011 | Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House | |||
06/04/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
06/04/2011 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 6206 | |||
06/02/2011 | Matter Pass Retained | |||
06/02/2011 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 6206 | |||
04/28/2011 | File Number 663 | |||
04/28/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 403 | |||
04/28/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/28/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/27/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/16/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/08/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |