|
07/01/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Public Act 11-53
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8359
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Calendar Number 576
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7830
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
File Number 626
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 385
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/14
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|