|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-83
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 597
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6045
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
File Number 221
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 165
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/08/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate
|
|
|