|
06/30/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Public Act 11-54
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Rules Suspended
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
House Calendar Number 598
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6796
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
File Number 740
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 456
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/04/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/31/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute APP
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
03/21/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Education
|
|
|
|
02/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/17
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement
|
|
|