|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-85
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8635
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 613
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7652
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
File Number 796
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 490
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/10/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute APP
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
|
02/09/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Education
|
|
|