05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 513 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/05/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/04/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/17/2011 | File Number 77 | |||
03/17/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 89 | |||
03/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/16/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/02/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |