06/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/07/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/04/2011 | Public Act 11-46 | |||
05/25/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
05/25/2011 | House Passed | |||
05/13/2011 | House Calendar Number 514 | |||
05/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/12/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/05/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/04/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/18/2011 | File Number 563 | |||
04/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 343 | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |