05/12/2011 | House Calendar Number 496 | |||
05/12/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
04/14/2011 | File Number 532 | |||
04/14/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 319 | |||
04/14/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/14/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/08/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/31/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/17/2011 | Public Hearing 03/21 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |