05/05/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/18/2011 | File Number 564 | |||
04/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 344 | |||
04/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/18/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/31/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/30/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/10/2011 | Public Hearing 02/14 | |||
02/09/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Government Administration and Elections |