04/27/2011 | Motion Failed JF | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/13/2011 | File Number 506 | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 297 | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/12/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/28/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/07/2011 | Public Hearing 03/11 | |||
02/10/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |