05/24/2011 | File Number 839 | |||
05/24/2011 | New File by Committee on Banks | |||
05/24/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/18/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/23/11 5:00 PM | |||
05/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
05/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Banks | |||
05/02/2011 | File Number 692 | |||
05/02/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 429 | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/12/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/28/2011 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/14/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |