|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-174
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7361
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Disagreeing Action, Tabled for Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule A 7361
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 614
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A, B
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 7458
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7361
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
File Number 630
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 388
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/09
|
|
|
|
02/14/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|