06/01/2011 | House Calendar Number 577 | |||
06/01/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/31/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/31/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/31/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5871 | |||
05/03/2011 | File Number 724 | |||
05/03/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 441 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/16/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/14/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |