05/23/2011 | House Calendar Number 545 | |||
05/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/20/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/20/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6734 | |||
04/27/2011 | No New File by Committee on Judiciary | |||
04/27/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/27/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/27/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/21/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/30/2011 | File Number 292 | |||
03/30/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 190 | |||
03/24/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Banks |