06/08/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Human Services | |||
05/11/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
04/20/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/20/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/19/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 446 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 279 | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/22/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/01 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Human Services |