05/03/2011 | File Number 725 | |||
05/03/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 442 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/31/2011 | Public Hearing 04/04 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |