06/06/2011 | House Calendar Number 630 | |||
06/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/06/2011 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
06/06/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
06/06/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 6636 | |||
04/20/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
04/20/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/19/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/19/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/29/2011 | File Number 261 | |||
03/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 186 | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/28/2011 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |