06/01/2011 | House Calendar Number 578 | |||
06/01/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/31/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/31/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
05/04/2011 | No New File by Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/03/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Insurance and Real Estate | |||
04/18/2011 | File Number 565 | |||
04/18/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 350 | |||
04/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/11/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM | |||
02/28/2011 | Public Hearing 03/04 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |