03/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/25/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary | |||
03/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Judiciary | |||
03/18/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Environment | |||
03/18/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Environment | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |