|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-175
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 615
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8099
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
File Number 533
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 322
|
|
|
|
04/08/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/13/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/23
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health
|
|
|