03/24/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/24/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/24/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/21/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Human Services | |||
03/01/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Transportation | |||
03/01/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Transportation | |||
02/25/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Transportation | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |