03/29/2011 | File Number 262 | |||
03/29/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 178 | |||
03/29/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/29/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/28/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/09/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on General Law | |||
03/08/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on General Law | |||
03/07/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference General Law | |||
02/25/2011 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |||
02/17/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Health |