|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-176
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 616
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A, B
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8237
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Matter Pass Retained
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8088
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
File Number 331
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 222
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/23/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Human Services
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/24
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Aging
|
|
|