03/31/2011 | File Number 306 | |||
03/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 210 | |||
03/31/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/31/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Insurance and Real Estate |