07/13/2011 | Signed by the Governor | |||
06/30/2011 | Transmitted to the Secretary of State | |||
06/28/2011 | Public Act 11-166 | |||
06/08/2011 | In Concurrence | |||
06/08/2011 | House Passed | |||
06/08/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
04/15/2011 | House Calendar Number 331 | |||
04/15/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
04/13/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
03/31/2011 | File Number 307 | |||
03/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 204 | |||
03/31/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/31/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
03/09/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/09/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Human Services | |||
03/03/2011 | Joint Favorable HS | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/22 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Children |