|
07/13/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/30/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/28/2011
|
Public Act 11-177
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/08/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
House Calendar Number 579
|
|
|
|
06/01/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
05/19/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Education
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5541
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
File Number 566
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 351
|
|
|
|
04/11/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/18/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Judiciary
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|