|
07/01/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/16/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Public Act 11-66
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
House Calendar Number 497
|
|
|
|
05/12/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Senate Passed
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
File Number 293
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 192
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/15/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
03/09/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
03/03/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Public Safety and Security
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/16/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Children
|
|
|