06/05/2011 | House Calendar Number 617 | |||
06/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/03/2011 | Senate Passed | |||
06/03/2011 | Amendment Withdrawn, Senate Amendment Schedule A 6647 | |||
06/03/2011 | Designated Only Senate Amendment Schedule A 6647 | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 165 | |||
03/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 145 | |||
03/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/23/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/11/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/10/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Labor and Public Employees |