05/12/2011 | House Calendar Number 498 | |||
05/12/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
05/11/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
05/11/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 5567 | |||
04/06/2011 | No New File by Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
04/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/06/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/06/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/05/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Higher Education and Employment Advancement | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 166 | |||
03/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 141 | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/04/2011 | Public Hearing 03/08 | |||
02/16/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on General Law |