04/20/2011 | Vote to Hold Until Next Meeting | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law | |||
04/04/2011 | File Number 332 | |||
04/04/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 216 | |||
04/04/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/04/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/28/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/04/11 10:00 AM | |||
03/22/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/18/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/23 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Environment |