04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
04/13/2011 | No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
04/13/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/13/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/13/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/13/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/07/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections | |||
03/31/2011 | File Number 298 | |||
03/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 211 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |