|
07/08/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-86
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 619
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Rejected Senate Amendment Schedule B 8116
|
|
|
|
06/03/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7604
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
File Number 631
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 386
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
04/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 10:00 AM
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/28/2011
|
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/22/2011
|
Joint Favorable Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
03/04/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/08
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|