|
06/30/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-84
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
On Consent Calendar
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 620
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8331
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/21/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Labor and Public Employees
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
04/01/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Transportation
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
File Number 201
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 149
|
|
|
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/23/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/25/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/01
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce
|
|
|