|
06/30/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
|
06/24/2011
|
Transmitted to the Secretary of State
|
|
|
|
06/17/2011
|
Public Act 11-71
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
In Concurrence
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Rejected House Amendment Schedule A 8580
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B
|
|
|
|
06/07/2011
|
House Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
House Calendar Number 621
|
|
|
|
06/05/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Rules Suspended, Transmitted to the House
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A,B
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule B 8299
|
|
|
|
06/04/2011
|
Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8294
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/10/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
File Number 638
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 396
|
|
|
|
04/20/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/26/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
03/10/2011
|
Public Hearing 03/14
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|