05/18/2011 | No New File by Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/18/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
05/04/2011 | No New File by Committee on Public Health | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Public Health | |||
04/20/2011 | File Number 605 | |||
04/20/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 375 | |||
04/14/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/19/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/10/2011 | Public Hearing 03/14 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |