|
05/31/2011
|
File Number 856
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
New File by Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate
|
|
|
|
05/31/2011
|
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/25/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/31/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
05/24/2011
|
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Joint Favorable Substitute
|
|
|
|
05/20/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
|
05/17/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
05/16/2011
|
Joint Favorable
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development
|
|
|
|
05/04/2011
|
No New File by Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on Government Administration and Elections
|
|
|
|
04/13/2011
|
No New File by Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
04/07/2011
|
Referred by Senate to Committee on General Law
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
File Number 290
|
|
|
|
03/30/2011
|
Senate Calendar Number 194
|
|
|
|
03/24/2011
|
Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/29/11 5:00 PM
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Public Hearing 02/22
|
|
|
|
02/17/2011
|
Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security
|
|
|