06/04/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Commerce | |||
05/26/2011 | File Number 845 | |||
05/26/2011 | New File by Committee on Environment | |||
05/26/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/26/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/20/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/25/11 5:00 PM | |||
05/18/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Environment | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 167 | |||
03/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 134 | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |