06/08/2011 | Senate Recommitted to Commerce | |||
05/05/2011 | Moved to Foot of the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/23/2011 | File Number 168 | |||
03/23/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 135 | |||
03/23/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
03/23/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/17/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/22/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/09/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
02/18/2011 | Public Hearing 02/24 | |||
02/17/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce |