LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Connecticut CT
Legislatures
2011 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB01023
Action History
CT
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01023
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Connecticut 2011 Regular Session
Connecticut Senate Bill SB01023
Action History
03/15/2011
Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
03/14/2011
Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding
03/11/2011
Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/09/2011
Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office
03/08/2011
Joint Favorable Substitute Change of Reference Finance, Revenue and Bonding
02/18/2011
Public Hearing 02/24
02/17/2011
Referred to Joint Committee on Commerce