05/17/2011 | No New File by Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/17/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/17/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/17/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/16/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
05/11/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
05/02/2011 | File Number 693 | |||
05/02/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 430 | |||
04/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 10:00 AM | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/21/2011 | Public Hearing 03/25 | |||
02/18/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |