06/06/2011 | House Calendar Number 631 | |||
06/06/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/06/2011 | Transmitted Pursuant To Joint Rule 17 | |||
06/06/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
06/06/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 8171 | |||
05/03/2011 | File Number 726 | |||
05/03/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 443 | |||
05/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/03/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/26/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 05/02/11 5:00 PM | |||
04/15/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/15/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/14/2011 | Public Hearing 03/18 | |||
02/18/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Judiciary |