04/14/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Finance, Revenue and Bonding | |||
04/07/2011 | File Number 449 | |||
04/07/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 286 | |||
04/07/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
04/07/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
04/01/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 04/06/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/25/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
03/23/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute | |||
03/15/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, House to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/14/2011 | Favorable Change of Reference, Senate to Committee on Planning and Development | |||
03/08/2011 | Joint Favorable Change of Reference Planning and Development | |||
02/25/2011 | Public Hearing 03/03 | |||
02/18/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Public Safety and Security |