06/03/2011 | House Calendar Number 601 | |||
06/03/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, House | |||
06/02/2011 | On Consent Calendar | |||
06/02/2011 | Senate Passed as Amended by Senate Amendment Schedule A | |||
06/02/2011 | Senate Adopted Senate Amendment Schedule A 7617 | |||
05/05/2011 | No New File by Committee on Appropriations | |||
05/05/2011 | Favorable Report, Tabled for the Calendar, Senate | |||
05/05/2011 | Reported Out of Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/05/2011 | Filed with Legislative Commissioners' Office | |||
05/04/2011 | Joint Favorable | |||
04/27/2011 | Referred by Senate to Committee on Appropriations | |||
03/31/2011 | File Number 300 | |||
03/31/2011 | Senate Calendar Number 201 | |||
03/25/2011 | Referred to Office of Legislative Research and Office of Fiscal Analysis 03/30/11 5:00 PM | |||
03/17/2011 | Joint Favorable Substitute FL | |||
02/24/2011 | Public Hearing 02/28 | |||
02/23/2011 | Referred to Joint Committee on Education |